House
|
05/15/2013
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2013
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2013
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3371
|
House
|
05/08/2013
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2013
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2013
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2013
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2013
|
Referred to Economic & Small Business Development
|
|
Journal Page: 1577
|
House
|
04/16/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1577
|
House
|
04/04/2013
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1427
|
Senate
|
04/04/2013
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 754
|
Senate
|
04/04/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 719
|
Senate
|
04/04/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 719
|
Senate
|
04/04/2013
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 719
|
Senate
|
04/04/2013
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 718
|
Senate
|
04/04/2013
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 718
|
Senate
|
04/04/2013
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA2 Watson
|
Journal Page: 718
|
Senate
|
04/04/2013
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 718
|
Senate
|
04/04/2013
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 718
|
Senate
|
04/04/2013
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 717
|
Senate
|
04/04/2013
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 717
|
Senate
|
04/03/2013
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2013
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2013
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 660
|
Senate
|
03/27/2013
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2013
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 619
|
Senate
|
03/20/2013
|
Reported from s/c favorably with substitute
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2013
|
Testimony taken in subcommittee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2013
|
Considered by s/c in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2013
|
Left pending in subcommittee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2013
|
Testimony taken in subcommittee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2013
|
Considered by s/c in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2013
|
Left pending in subcommittee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2013
|
Testimony taken in subcommittee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2013
|
Considered by s/c in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2013
|
Referred to s/c on Public-Private Partnerships by Chair
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2013
|
Referred to Economic Development
|
|
Journal Page: 255
|
Senate
|
02/20/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 255
|
Senate
|
02/12/2013
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/12/2013
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|