Senate | 03/13/2013 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/13/2013 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 487 | |
Senate | 03/12/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/12/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/05/2013 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/05/2013 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/05/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/05/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/20/2013 | Referred to Education | Journal Page: 257 | |
Senate | 02/20/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 257 | |
Senate | 02/12/2013 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/12/2013 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |