House | 05/09/2013 | Referred to Agriculture & Livestock | Journal Page: 3016 | |
House | 05/09/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 3016 | |
House | 05/09/2013 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 3018 | |
Senate | 05/09/2013 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1728 | |
Senate | 05/09/2013 | Passed | Journal Page: 1707 | |
Senate | 05/09/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1707 | |
Senate | 05/09/2013 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1707 | |
Senate | 05/09/2013 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1707 | |
Senate | 05/09/2013 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1707 | |
Senate | 05/09/2013 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1707 | |
Senate | 05/09/2013 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 1707 | |
Senate | 05/09/2013 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/03/2013 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/03/2013 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/03/2013 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 1433 | |
Senate | 05/01/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/01/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 05/01/2013 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 1369 | |
Senate | 04/15/2013 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/15/2013 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/15/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/15/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/20/2013 | Referred to Agriculture, Rural Affairs & Homeland Security | Journal Page: 257 | |
Senate | 02/20/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 257 | |
Senate | 02/12/2013 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/12/2013 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |