Texas 2013 - 83rd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB53 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Zaffirini S.B. No. 53
 (In the Senate - Filed November 12, 2012; January 28, 2013,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Health and Human
 Services; March 4, 2013, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0;
 March 4, 2013, sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 53 By:  Zaffirini


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the definition of "advanced life support" for the
 purposes of providing emergency medical services.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subdivision (1), Section 773.003, Health and
 Safety Code, is amended to read as follows:
 (1)  "Advanced life support" means emergency
 prehospital care that uses invasive medical acts, including an
 advanced life support assessment.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 * * * * *