Senate | 05/20/2013 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 2255 | |
Senate | 04/24/2013 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/08/2013 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 752 | |
Senate | 04/03/2013 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 694 | |
Senate | 04/02/2013 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/26/2013 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/26/2013 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 623 | |
Senate | 03/19/2013 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/19/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/19/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/20/2013 | Referred to Health & Human Services | Journal Page: 258 | |
Senate | 02/20/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 258 | |
Senate | 02/18/2013 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 234 | |
Senate | 02/13/2013 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/13/2013 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |