E
|
06/14/2013
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
06/14/2013
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3868
|
E
|
05/25/2013
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3737
|
House
|
05/25/2013
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 4914
|
Senate
|
05/23/2013
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3053
|
Senate
|
05/21/2013
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 2910
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
House passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2166
|
House
|
05/20/2013
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3773
|
House
|
05/20/2013
|
Record vote
|
RV#974
|
Journal Page: 3772
|
House
|
05/20/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3772
|
House
|
05/20/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3772
|
House
|
05/17/2013
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3627
|
House
|
05/17/2013
|
Passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 3627
|
House
|
05/17/2013
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3627
|
House
|
05/17/2013
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2013
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2013
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2013
|
Transferred to Calendars Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2013
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2013
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2013
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2013
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3090
|
House
|
05/07/2013
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2013
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2013
|
Referred to Public Education
|
|
Journal Page: 1733
|
House
|
04/22/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1733
|
House
|
04/19/2013
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1697
|
Senate
|
04/18/2013
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1119
|
Senate
|
04/18/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1008
|
Senate
|
04/18/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1008
|
Senate
|
04/18/2013
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1008
|
Senate
|
04/18/2013
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1008
|
Senate
|
04/18/2013
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1008
|
Senate
|
04/18/2013
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1008
|
Senate
|
04/18/2013
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1008
|
Senate
|
04/17/2013
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2013
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2013
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2013
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 912
|
Senate
|
04/11/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2013
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2013
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2013
|
Referred to Education
|
|
Journal Page: 258
|
Senate
|
02/20/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 258
|
Senate
|
02/19/2013
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 244
|
Senate
|
02/13/2013
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2013
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|