E | 06/14/2013 | Effective immediately | ||
E | 06/14/2013 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 3868 | |
E | 05/16/2013 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 1908 | |
House | 05/16/2013 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 3519 | |
Senate | 05/16/2013 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 1896 | |
Senate | 05/15/2013 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 1908 | |
Senate | 05/15/2013 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 1821 | |
House | 05/14/2013 | Reason for vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3216 | |
House | 05/14/2013 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3216 | |
House | 05/14/2013 | Record vote | RV#819 | Journal Page: 3215 |
House | 05/14/2013 | Passed | Journal Page: 3215 | |
House | 05/14/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3215 | |
House | 05/13/2013 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3103 | |
House | 05/13/2013 | Passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 3103 | |
House | 05/13/2013 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3103 | |
House | 05/13/2013 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/10/2013 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/07/2013 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/07/2013 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/06/2013 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2722 | |
House | 05/01/2013 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/01/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/15/2013 | Referred to Higher Education | Journal Page: 1558 | |
House | 04/15/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1558 | |
House | 04/11/2013 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1513 | |
Senate | 04/11/2013 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 912 | |
Senate | 04/11/2013 | Passed | Journal Page: 803 | |
Senate | 04/11/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 803 | |
Senate | 04/11/2013 | Record vote | Journal Page: 803 | |
Senate | 04/11/2013 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 803 | |
Senate | 04/11/2013 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 803 | |
Senate | 04/11/2013 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 803 | |
Senate | 04/11/2013 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 803 | |
Senate | 04/11/2013 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/10/2013 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/28/2013 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/28/2013 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/28/2013 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 660 | |
Senate | 03/27/2013 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/27/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/27/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/20/2013 | Referred to Higher Education | Journal Page: 261 | |
Senate | 02/20/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 261 | |
Senate | 02/14/2013 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/14/2013 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |