E
|
05/25/2013
|
Effective on 9/1/13
|
|
|
E
|
05/25/2013
|
Filed without the Governor's signature
|
|
Journal Page: 3738
|
E
|
05/14/2013
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 1810
|
House
|
05/14/2013
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 3240
|
Senate
|
05/14/2013
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1800
|
Senate
|
05/13/2013
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 1809
|
House
|
05/13/2013
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3193
|
Senate
|
05/13/2013
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1759
|
Senate
|
05/13/2013
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 1759
|
Senate
|
05/13/2013
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 1759
|
Senate
|
05/13/2013
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1758
|
Senate
|
05/06/2013
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 1450
|
House
|
05/03/2013
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2306
|
House
|
05/03/2013
|
Record vote
|
RV#498
|
Journal Page: 2306
|
House
|
05/03/2013
|
Passed as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2306
|
House
|
05/03/2013
|
Amended
|
1-Geren
|
Journal Page: 2305
|
House
|
05/03/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2305
|
House
|
05/02/2013
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2258
|
House
|
05/02/2013
|
Amendment withdrawn
|
2-Dutton
|
Journal Page: 2257
|
House
|
05/02/2013
|
Amended
|
1-Geren
|
Journal Page: 2257
|
House
|
05/02/2013
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2257
|
House
|
05/02/2013
|
Laid out in lieu of companion
|
HB 1307
|
Journal Page: 2257
|
House
|
05/02/2013
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2013
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2013
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2277
|
House
|
04/16/2013
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2013
|
Referred to Natural Resources
|
|
Journal Page: 1453
|
House
|
04/08/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1453
|
House
|
04/04/2013
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1421
|
Senate
|
04/03/2013
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 732
|
Senate
|
04/03/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 691
|
Senate
|
04/03/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 691
|
Senate
|
04/03/2013
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 691
|
Senate
|
04/03/2013
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 691
|
Senate
|
04/03/2013
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 691
|
Senate
|
04/03/2013
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 691
|
Senate
|
04/03/2013
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 691
|
Senate
|
04/02/2013
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2013
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2013
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 658
|
Senate
|
03/26/2013
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2013
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2013
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 569
|
Senate
|
03/19/2013
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2013
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 515
|
Senate
|
02/20/2013
|
Referred to Business & Commerce
|
|
Journal Page: 261
|
Senate
|
02/20/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 261
|
Senate
|
02/14/2013
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2013
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|