Senate | 03/20/2013 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/19/2013 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/13/2013 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 485 | |
Senate | 03/12/2013 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/12/2013 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 444 | |
Senate | 03/12/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/12/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/05/2013 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/05/2013 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/05/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/05/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/20/2013 | Referred to Education | Journal Page: 261 | |
Senate | 02/20/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 261 | |
Senate | 02/14/2013 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/14/2013 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |