Texas 2013 - 83rd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB576 Compare Versions

The same version is selected twice. Please select two different versions to compare.
OldNewDifferences
11 By: Duncan S.B. No. 576
22 (In the Senate - Filed February 14, 2013;
33 February 20, 2013, read first time and referred to Committee on
44 Jurisprudence; March 4, 2013, reported adversely, with favorable
55 Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 5, Nays 0;
66 March 4, 2013, sent to printer.)
77 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 576 By: Hancock
88
99
1010 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
1111 AN ACT
1212 relating to the delay in the implementation of the abolishment of
1313 small claims courts.
1414 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
1515 SECTION 1. Section 5.07, Chapter 3 (H.B. 79), Acts of the
1616 82nd Legislature, 1st Called Session, 2011, is amended to read as
1717 follows:
1818 Sec. 5.07. Not later than May 1, 2013, the Texas Supreme
1919 Court shall promulgate the following rules, to be effective August
2020 31, 2013:
2121 (1) rules to define cases that constitute small claims
2222 cases;
2323 (2) rules of civil procedure applicable to small
2424 claims cases as required by Section 27.060, Government Code, as
2525 added by this article; and
2626 (3) rules for eviction proceedings.
2727 SECTION 2. Section 5.09, Chapter 3 (H.B. 79), Acts of the
2828 82nd Legislature, 1st Called Session, 2011, is amended to read as
2929 follows:
3030 Sec. 5.09. Sections 5.02 and 5.06 of this article take
3131 effect August 31 [May 1], 2013.
3232 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
3333 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
3434 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
3535 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
3636 Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
3737 * * * * *