Senate | 05/21/2013 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/07/2013 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/06/2013 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/06/2013 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 1500 | |
Senate | 05/02/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/02/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/02/2013 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/02/2013 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/02/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/02/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/20/2013 | Referred to Business & Commerce | Journal Page: 262 | |
Senate | 02/20/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 262 | |
Senate | 02/14/2013 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/14/2013 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |