E
|
06/14/2013
|
Effective on . . . . . . . . . . . . . . .
|
June 14, 2013
|
|
E
|
06/14/2013
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3868
|
E
|
05/25/2013
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3737
|
House
|
05/25/2013
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 4914
|
Senate
|
05/23/2013
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3053
|
Senate
|
05/21/2013
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 2910
|
House
|
05/20/2013
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3900
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2107
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 2107
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 2107
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2101
|
Senate
|
05/15/2013
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 1858
|
House
|
05/15/2013
|
Record vote
|
RV#837
|
Journal Page: 3298
|
House
|
05/15/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3298
|
House
|
05/15/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3298
|
House
|
05/14/2013
|
Passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 3227
|
House
|
05/14/2013
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3227
|
House
|
05/14/2013
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2013
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2013
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2013
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2013
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3019
|
House
|
05/01/2013
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2013
|
Amendment(s) considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2013
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2013
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2013
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2071
|
House
|
04/24/2013
|
Referred to State Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 1824
|
House
|
04/24/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1824
|
House
|
04/18/2013
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1651
|
Senate
|
04/17/2013
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1073
|
Senate
|
04/17/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 969
|
Senate
|
04/17/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 969
|
Senate
|
04/17/2013
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 969
|
Senate
|
04/17/2013
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 969
|
Senate
|
04/17/2013
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 969
|
Senate
|
04/17/2013
|
Amendment adopted as amended
|
FA1 Duncan
|
Journal Page: 969
|
Senate
|
04/17/2013
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 969
|
Senate
|
04/17/2013
|
Amendment amended
|
|
Journal Page: 969
|
Senate
|
04/17/2013
|
Amendment to amendment offered
|
FA2 Duncan
|
Journal Page: 968
|
Senate
|
04/17/2013
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 Duncan
|
Journal Page: 965
|
Senate
|
04/17/2013
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 965
|
Senate
|
04/17/2013
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 965
|
Senate
|
04/17/2013
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 974
|
Senate
|
04/10/2013
|
Corrected comm. report printed & distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2013
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2013
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2013
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 753
|
Senate
|
04/02/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2013
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2013
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2013
|
Referred to Business & Commerce
|
|
Journal Page: 262
|
Senate
|
02/20/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 262
|
Senate
|
02/14/2013
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2013
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|