House | 05/07/2013 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 05/07/2013 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 05/07/2013 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 05/07/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 05/07/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 04/08/2013 | Referred to Natural Resources | Journal Page: 1453 | |
House | 04/08/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1453 | |
House | 03/14/2013 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 751 | |
Senate | 03/13/2013 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 519 | |
Senate | 03/13/2013 | Passed | Journal Page: 471 | |
Senate | 03/13/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 471 | |
Senate | 03/13/2013 | Record vote | Journal Page: 471 | |
Senate | 03/13/2013 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 471 | |
Senate | 03/13/2013 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 471 | |
Senate | 03/13/2013 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 471 | |
Senate | 03/13/2013 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 471 | |
Senate | 03/13/2013 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/12/2013 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 443 | |
Senate | 03/11/2013 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 395 | |
Senate | 03/06/2013 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/06/2013 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/06/2013 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 385 | |
Senate | 03/05/2013 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/05/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/05/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/20/2013 | Referred to Natural Resources | Journal Page: 263 | |
Senate | 02/20/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 263 | |
Senate | 02/15/2013 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/15/2013 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |