House | 04/30/2013 | Referred to Business & Industry | Journal Page: 2072 | |
House | 04/30/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2072 | |
House | 04/25/2013 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1848 | |
Senate | 04/25/2013 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1312 | |
Senate | 04/25/2013 | Passed | Journal Page: 1206 | |
Senate | 04/25/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1206 | |
Senate | 04/25/2013 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1206 | |
Senate | 04/25/2013 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1206 | |
Senate | 04/25/2013 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1206 | |
Senate | 04/25/2013 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1206 | |
Senate | 04/25/2013 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 1206 | |
Senate | 04/25/2013 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/03/2013 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/03/2013 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/03/2013 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 695 | |
Senate | 03/27/2013 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/27/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/27/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/20/2013 | No action taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/20/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/25/2013 | Referred to Intergovernmental Relations | Journal Page: 277 | |
Senate | 02/25/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 277 | |
Senate | 02/15/2013 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/15/2013 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |