E | 05/18/2013 | Effective immediately | ||
E | 05/18/2013 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 2258 | |
E | 05/07/2013 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 1577 | |
House | 05/06/2013 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 2548 | |
Senate | 05/06/2013 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 1498 | |
Senate | 05/03/2013 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 1500 | |
Senate | 05/03/2013 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 1420 | |
House | 05/02/2013 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2204 | |
House | 05/02/2013 | Record vote | RV#437 | Journal Page: 2204 |
House | 05/02/2013 | Passed | Journal Page: 2204 | |
House | 05/02/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2204 | |
House | 05/02/2013 | Passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 2175 | |
House | 05/02/2013 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2175 | |
House | 05/02/2013 | Laid out in lieu of companion | HB 1547 | Journal Page: 2175 |
House | 04/26/2013 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 04/26/2013 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/25/2013 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1982 | |
House | 04/16/2013 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/16/2013 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 04/16/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/08/2013 | Referred to Natural Resources | Journal Page: 1453 | |
House | 04/08/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1453 | |
House | 03/21/2013 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 961 | |
Senate | 03/21/2013 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 609 | |
Senate | 03/21/2013 | Passed | Journal Page: 566 | |
Senate | 03/21/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 566 | |
Senate | 03/21/2013 | Record vote | Journal Page: 566 | |
Senate | 03/21/2013 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 566 | |
Senate | 03/21/2013 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 566 | |
Senate | 03/21/2013 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 566 | |
Senate | 03/21/2013 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 566 | |
Senate | 03/21/2013 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/11/2013 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/11/2013 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/11/2013 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 397 | |
Senate | 03/05/2013 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/05/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/05/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/25/2013 | Referred to Natural Resources | Journal Page: 277 | |
Senate | 02/25/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 277 | |
Senate | 02/15/2013 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/15/2013 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |