E | 06/14/2013 | Effective on 9/1/13 | ||
E | 06/14/2013 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 3868 | |
E | 05/27/2013 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 3867 | |
House | 05/26/2013 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 5381 | |
Senate | 05/26/2013 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 3778 | |
Senate | 05/24/2013 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 3737 | |
Senate | 05/23/2013 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 2916 | |
House | 05/22/2013 | Record vote | RV#1057 | Journal Page: 4169 |
House | 05/22/2013 | Passed | Journal Page: 4169 | |
House | 05/22/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 4169 | |
House | 05/22/2013 | Passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 4154 | |
House | 05/22/2013 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 4154 | |
House | 05/22/2013 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 05/21/2013 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 04/24/2013 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 04/24/2013 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/24/2013 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1913 | |
House | 04/18/2013 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/18/2013 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 04/18/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/10/2013 | Referred to Defense & Veterans' Affairs | Journal Page: 1494 | |
House | 04/10/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1494 | |
House | 04/04/2013 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1423 | |
Senate | 04/04/2013 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 754 | |
Senate | 04/04/2013 | Passed | Journal Page: 698 | |
Senate | 04/04/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 698 | |
Senate | 04/04/2013 | Record vote | Journal Page: 698 | |
Senate | 04/04/2013 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 698 | |
Senate | 04/04/2013 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 698 | |
Senate | 04/04/2013 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 698 | |
Senate | 04/04/2013 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 698 | |
Senate | 04/04/2013 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/04/2013 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 730 | |
Senate | 03/27/2013 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/27/2013 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/27/2013 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 660 | |
Senate | 03/27/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/27/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/25/2013 | Referred to Transportation | Journal Page: 278 | |
Senate | 02/25/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 278 | |
Senate | 02/18/2013 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/18/2013 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |