E | 05/18/2013 | Effective on 1/1/14 | ||
E | 05/18/2013 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 2258 | |
E | 05/07/2013 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 1577 | |
House | 05/07/2013 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 2719 | |
Senate | 05/07/2013 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 1513 | |
Senate | 05/06/2013 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 1577 | |
Senate | 05/06/2013 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 1450 | |
House | 05/04/2013 | Record vote | RV#543 | Journal Page: 2408 |
House | 05/04/2013 | Passed | Journal Page: 2408 | |
House | 05/04/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2408 | |
House | 05/03/2013 | Passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 2308 | |
House | 05/03/2013 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2307 | |
House | 05/03/2013 | Laid out in lieu of companion | CSHB 1087 | Journal Page: 2307 |
House | 05/02/2013 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/02/2013 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/01/2013 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2276 | |
House | 04/30/2013 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/30/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/08/2013 | Referred to Business & Industry | Journal Page: 1452 | |
House | 04/08/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1452 | |
House | 03/14/2013 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 745 | |
Senate | 03/13/2013 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 519 | |
Senate | 03/13/2013 | Passed | Journal Page: 463 | |
Senate | 03/13/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 463 | |
Senate | 03/13/2013 | Record vote | Journal Page: 463 | |
Senate | 03/13/2013 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 463 | |
Senate | 03/13/2013 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 463 | |
Senate | 03/13/2013 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 463 | |
Senate | 03/13/2013 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 463 | |
Senate | 03/13/2013 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 02/13/2013 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 02/13/2013 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 02/13/2013 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 218 | |
Senate | 02/12/2013 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 02/12/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 02/12/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 01/28/2013 | Referred to Business & Commerce | Journal Page: 92 | |
Senate | 01/28/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 92 | |
Senate | 11/12/2012 | Filed | ||
Senate | 11/12/2012 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |