Senate | 04/29/2013 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/25/2013 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/09/2013 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/08/2013 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/04/2013 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/03/2013 | Record vote | Journal Page: 684 | |
Senate | 04/03/2013 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 684 | |
Senate | 04/03/2013 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 684 | |
Senate | 04/03/2013 | Amended | Journal Page: 684 | |
Senate | 04/03/2013 | Amendment(s) offered | FA1 Lucio | Journal Page: 683 |
Senate | 04/03/2013 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 683 | |
Senate | 04/03/2013 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 683 | |
Senate | 04/03/2013 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/02/2013 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/26/2013 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/18/2013 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/18/2013 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/18/2013 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 518 | |
Senate | 03/12/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/12/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/25/2013 | Referred to Business & Commerce | Journal Page: 279 | |
Senate | 02/25/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 279 | |
Senate | 02/18/2013 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/18/2013 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |