E | 06/14/2013 | Effective on 9/1/13 | ||
E | 06/14/2013 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 3868 | |
E | 05/28/2013 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 3867 | |
House | 05/27/2013 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 5435 | |
Senate | 05/27/2013 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 3853 | |
Senate | 05/26/2013 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 3866 | |
House | 05/23/2013 | Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported | Journal Page: 4554 | |
Senate | 05/23/2013 | Record vote | Journal Page: 2955 | |
Senate | 05/23/2013 | Senate concurs in House amendment(s) | Journal Page: 2955 | |
Senate | 05/23/2013 | Read | Journal Page: 2954 | |
Senate | 05/23/2013 | House amendment(s) laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 2954 | |
Senate | 05/20/2013 | House passage as amended reported | Journal Page: 2166 | |
House | 05/20/2013 | Record vote | RV#959 | Journal Page: 3757 |
House | 05/20/2013 | Passed | Journal Page: 3757 | |
House | 05/20/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3757 | |
House | 05/17/2013 | Passed to 3rd reading as amended | Journal Page: 3618 | |
House | 05/17/2013 | Amended | 1-Kuempel | Journal Page: 3618 |
House | 05/17/2013 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3618 | |
House | 05/17/2013 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/15/2013 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/23/2013 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/22/2013 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/22/2013 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1775 | |
House | 04/16/2013 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/16/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/08/2013 | Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures | Journal Page: 1454 | |
House | 04/08/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1454 | |
House | 03/14/2013 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 751 | |
Senate | 03/13/2013 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 519 | |
Senate | 03/13/2013 | Passed | Journal Page: 471 | |
Senate | 03/13/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 471 | |
Senate | 03/13/2013 | Record vote | Journal Page: 471 | |
Senate | 03/13/2013 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 471 | |
Senate | 03/13/2013 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 471 | |
Senate | 03/13/2013 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 471 | |
Senate | 03/13/2013 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 471 | |
Senate | 03/13/2013 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/06/2013 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/06/2013 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/06/2013 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 385 | |
Senate | 03/05/2013 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/05/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/05/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/25/2013 | Referred to Business & Commerce | Journal Page: 283 | |
Senate | 02/25/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 283 | |
Senate | 02/19/2013 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/19/2013 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |