House
|
05/14/2013
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2013
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2013
|
Referred to Public Education
|
|
Journal Page: 1578
|
House
|
04/16/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1578
|
House
|
04/12/2013
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1543
|
Senate
|
04/11/2013
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 912
|
Senate
|
04/11/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 828
|
Senate
|
04/11/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 828
|
Senate
|
04/11/2013
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 828
|
Senate
|
04/11/2013
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 827
|
Senate
|
04/11/2013
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 827
|
Senate
|
04/11/2013
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 827
|
Senate
|
04/11/2013
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 827
|
Senate
|
04/11/2013
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 882
|
Senate
|
04/10/2013
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2013
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2013
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 754
|
Senate
|
04/04/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2013
|
Reported from s/c favorably with substitute
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2013
|
Considered by s/c in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2013
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 620
|
Senate
|
03/25/2013
|
Left pending in subcommittee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2013
|
Testimony taken in subcommittee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2013
|
Considered by s/c in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2013
|
Referred to s/c on Fiscal Matters by Chair
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2013
|
Referred to Finance
|
|
Journal Page: 283
|
Senate
|
02/25/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 283
|
Senate
|
02/19/2013
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2013
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|