E
|
06/14/2013
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
06/14/2013
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3868
|
E
|
05/25/2013
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3737
|
House
|
05/25/2013
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 4914
|
Senate
|
05/23/2013
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3053
|
Senate
|
05/21/2013
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 2910
|
House
|
05/20/2013
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3900
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2090
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 2089
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 2089
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2089
|
Senate
|
05/09/2013
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 1702
|
House
|
05/09/2013
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2850
|
House
|
05/09/2013
|
Record vote
|
RV#692
|
Journal Page: 2850
|
House
|
05/09/2013
|
Passed as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2850
|
House
|
05/09/2013
|
Amended
|
1-Anchia, Branch, and Villalba
|
Journal Page: 2849
|
House
|
05/09/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2849
|
House
|
05/08/2013
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2790
|
House
|
05/08/2013
|
Passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 2790
|
House
|
05/08/2013
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2789
|
House
|
05/08/2013
|
Laid out in lieu of companion
|
HB 1508
|
Journal Page: 2789
|
House
|
05/06/2013
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2013
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2013
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2551
|
House
|
05/01/2013
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2013
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2013
|
Referred to Urban Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 1454
|
House
|
04/08/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1454
|
House
|
04/04/2013
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1423
|
Senate
|
04/04/2013
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 754
|
Senate
|
04/04/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 698
|
Senate
|
04/04/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 698
|
Senate
|
04/04/2013
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 698
|
Senate
|
04/04/2013
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 698
|
Senate
|
04/04/2013
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 698
|
Senate
|
04/04/2013
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 698
|
Senate
|
04/04/2013
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 698
|
Senate
|
04/04/2013
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2013
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2013
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2013
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 609
|
Senate
|
03/20/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2013
|
Referred to Intergovernmental Relations
|
|
Journal Page: 283
|
Senate
|
02/25/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 283
|
Senate
|
02/19/2013
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2013
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|