Senate | 04/23/2013 | No action taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/23/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/17/2013 | No action taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/17/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/16/2013 | Meeting cancelled | ||
Senate | 04/16/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/09/2013 | No action taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/09/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/04/2013 | No action taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/04/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/02/2013 | No action taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/02/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/26/2013 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/26/2013 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/26/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/26/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/25/2013 | Referred to Criminal Justice | Journal Page: 284 | |
Senate | 02/25/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 284 | |
Senate | 02/19/2013 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/19/2013 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |