E
|
06/14/2013
|
Effective on 9/1/13
|
|
|
E
|
06/14/2013
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3868
|
E
|
05/25/2013
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3737
|
House
|
05/25/2013
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 4914
|
Senate
|
05/24/2013
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3280
|
Senate
|
05/21/2013
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 2910
|
House
|
05/20/2013
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3900
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2119
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 2119
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 2119
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2107
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 1918
|
House
|
05/16/2013
|
Record vote
|
RV#862
|
Journal Page: 3403
|
House
|
05/16/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3403
|
House
|
05/16/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3403
|
House
|
05/15/2013
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3353
|
House
|
05/15/2013
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3353
|
House
|
05/15/2013
|
Amended
|
1-Smith
|
Journal Page: 3353
|
House
|
05/15/2013
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3353
|
House
|
05/15/2013
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2013
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2013
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2013
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2013
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2551
|
House
|
04/30/2013
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2013
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2013
|
Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures
|
|
Journal Page: 1559
|
House
|
04/15/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1559
|
House
|
03/21/2013
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 961
|
Senate
|
03/21/2013
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 609
|
Senate
|
03/21/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 566
|
Senate
|
03/21/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 566
|
Senate
|
03/21/2013
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 566
|
Senate
|
03/21/2013
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 566
|
Senate
|
03/21/2013
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 566
|
Senate
|
03/21/2013
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 566
|
Senate
|
03/21/2013
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 566
|
Senate
|
03/21/2013
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2013
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2013
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2013
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 486
|
Senate
|
03/12/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2013
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2013
|
Referred to Business & Commerce
|
|
Journal Page: 285
|
Senate
|
02/25/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 285
|
Senate
|
02/19/2013
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2013
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|