Senate | 05/01/2013 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1369 | |
Senate | 04/29/2013 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1310 | |
Senate | 03/19/2013 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/19/2013 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/19/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/19/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/25/2013 | Referred to Health & Human Services | Journal Page: 285 | |
Senate | 02/25/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 285 | |
Senate | 02/20/2013 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/20/2013 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |