Texas 2013 83rd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB692 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Carona S.B. No. 692
 (In the Senate - Filed February 20, 2013; February 25, 2013,
 read first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs;
 March 13, 2013, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 9,
 Nays 0; March 13, 2013, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the filing by electronic mail of financial disclosures
 by certain county officers, county employees, or candidates for
 county office.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 159.003, Local Government Code, is
 amended by adding Subsection (c) to read as follows:
 (c)  The statement may be filed with the county clerk by
 electronic mail. The county clerk may prescribe guidelines for
 filing by electronic mail.
 SECTION 2.  Section 159.034, Local Government Code, is
 amended by adding Subsection (d) to read as follows:
 (d)  A report filed under this subchapter may be filed by
 electronic mail. The authority with whom the report is filed may
 prescribe guidelines for filing by electronic mail.
 SECTION 3.  Section 159.052, Local Government Code, is
 amended by adding Subsection (c) to read as follows:
 (c)  A financial statement filed with the county clerk may be
 filed by electronic mail. The county clerk may prescribe
 guidelines for filing by electronic mail under this subsection.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 * * * * *