E
|
06/14/2013
|
Effective on 1/1/14
|
|
|
E
|
06/14/2013
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3868
|
E
|
05/26/2013
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3834
|
House
|
05/26/2013
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 5381
|
Senate
|
05/25/2013
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3515
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 3068
|
House
|
05/22/2013
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4293
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2798
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 2798
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 2798
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2797
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2049
|
House
|
05/17/2013
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3596
|
House
|
05/17/2013
|
Record vote
|
RV#924
|
Journal Page: 3599
|
House
|
05/17/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3599
|
House
|
05/17/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3599
|
House
|
05/17/2013
|
Passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 3577
|
House
|
05/17/2013
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3577
|
House
|
05/17/2013
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2013
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2013
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2013
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2013
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2550
|
House
|
04/30/2013
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2013
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2013
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2013
|
Referred to Insurance
|
|
Journal Page: 1559
|
House
|
04/15/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1559
|
House
|
04/01/2013
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1187
|
Senate
|
03/27/2013
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 680
|
Senate
|
03/27/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 655
|
Senate
|
03/27/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 655
|
Senate
|
03/27/2013
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 655
|
Senate
|
03/27/2013
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 655
|
Senate
|
03/27/2013
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 655
|
Senate
|
03/27/2013
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 655
|
Senate
|
03/27/2013
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 655
|
Senate
|
03/27/2013
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2013
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2013
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2013
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 518
|
Senate
|
03/12/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2013
|
Referred to Business & Commerce
|
|
Journal Page: 287
|
Senate
|
02/25/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 287
|
Senate
|
02/21/2013
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2013
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|