E | 05/18/2013 | Effective immediately | ||
E | 05/18/2013 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 2258 | |
E | 05/09/2013 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 1728 | |
House | 05/09/2013 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 3016 | |
Senate | 05/09/2013 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 1680 | |
Senate | 05/08/2013 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 1728 | |
House | 05/08/2013 | Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported | Journal Page: 2841 | |
Senate | 05/08/2013 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1613 | |
Senate | 05/08/2013 | Senate concurs in House amendment(s) | Journal Page: 1613 | |
Senate | 05/08/2013 | Read | Journal Page: 1613 | |
Senate | 05/08/2013 | House amendment(s) laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 1612 | |
Senate | 04/29/2013 | House passage as amended reported | Journal Page: 1271 | |
House | 04/25/2013 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1861 | |
House | 04/25/2013 | Record vote | RV#304 | Journal Page: 1860 |
House | 04/25/2013 | Passed | Journal Page: 1860 | |
House | 04/25/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1860 | |
House | 04/24/2013 | Passed to 3rd reading as amended | Journal Page: 1809 | |
House | 04/24/2013 | Amended | 1-Eiland | Journal Page: 1809 |
House | 04/24/2013 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1809 | |
House | 04/24/2013 | Laid out in lieu of companion | HB 1902 | Journal Page: 1809 |
House | 04/24/2013 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/24/2013 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/23/2013 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1832 | |
House | 04/18/2013 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/18/2013 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/16/2013 | Referred to Insurance | Journal Page: 1578 | |
House | 04/16/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1578 | |
House | 03/21/2013 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 962 | |
Senate | 03/21/2013 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 609 | |
Senate | 03/21/2013 | Passed | Journal Page: 566 | |
Senate | 03/21/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 566 | |
Senate | 03/21/2013 | Record vote | Journal Page: 566 | |
Senate | 03/21/2013 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 566 | |
Senate | 03/21/2013 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 566 | |
Senate | 03/21/2013 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 566 | |
Senate | 03/21/2013 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 566 | |
Senate | 03/21/2013 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/13/2013 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/13/2013 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/13/2013 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 486 | |
Senate | 03/12/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/12/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/25/2013 | Referred to Business & Commerce | Journal Page: 287 | |
Senate | 02/25/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 287 | |
Senate | 02/21/2013 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/21/2013 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |