E | 05/18/2013 | Effective immediately | ||
E | 05/18/2013 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 2258 | |
E | 05/07/2013 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 1577 | |
House | 05/06/2013 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 2548 | |
Senate | 05/06/2013 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 1498 | |
Senate | 05/03/2013 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 1500 | |
Senate | 05/03/2013 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 1420 | |
House | 05/02/2013 | Record vote | RV#437 | Journal Page: 2208 |
House | 05/02/2013 | Passed | Journal Page: 2208 | |
House | 05/02/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2208 | |
House | 05/02/2013 | Passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 2191 | |
House | 05/02/2013 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2191 | |
House | 05/02/2013 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 05/01/2013 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 04/24/2013 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 04/24/2013 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/23/2013 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1832 | |
House | 04/18/2013 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/18/2013 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 04/18/2013 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/15/2013 | Referred to Insurance | Journal Page: 1559 | |
House | 04/15/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1559 | |
House | 04/01/2013 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1187 | |
Senate | 03/27/2013 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 680 | |
Senate | 03/27/2013 | Passed | Journal Page: 655 | |
Senate | 03/27/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 655 | |
Senate | 03/27/2013 | Record vote | Journal Page: 655 | |
Senate | 03/27/2013 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 655 | |
Senate | 03/27/2013 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 655 | |
Senate | 03/27/2013 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 655 | |
Senate | 03/27/2013 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 655 | |
Senate | 03/27/2013 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/20/2013 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/20/2013 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/20/2013 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 561 | |
Senate | 03/19/2013 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/19/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/19/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/25/2013 | Referred to Business & Commerce | Journal Page: 290 | |
Senate | 02/25/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 290 | |
Senate | 02/21/2013 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/21/2013 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |