E | 06/14/2013 | Effective on 9/1/13 | ||
E | 06/14/2013 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 3868 | |
E | 05/26/2013 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 3834 | |
House | 05/26/2013 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 5381 | |
Senate | 05/25/2013 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 3515 | |
Senate | 05/22/2013 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 3068 | |
Senate | 05/22/2013 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 2807 | |
House | 05/22/2013 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 4184 | |
House | 05/22/2013 | Record vote | RV#1069 | Journal Page: 4184 |
House | 05/22/2013 | Passed | Journal Page: 4184 | |
House | 05/22/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 4183 | |
House | 05/21/2013 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 4029 | |
House | 05/21/2013 | Passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 4029 | |
House | 05/21/2013 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 4028 | |
House | 05/20/2013 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/17/2013 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/16/2013 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/15/2013 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/15/2013 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 3521 | |
House | 05/14/2013 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/14/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/30/2013 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/30/2013 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/30/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/30/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 04/10/2013 | Referred to Insurance | Journal Page: 1494 | |
House | 04/10/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1494 | |
House | 04/04/2013 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1423 | |
Senate | 04/04/2013 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 754 | |
Senate | 04/04/2013 | Passed | Journal Page: 699 | |
Senate | 04/04/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 699 | |
Senate | 04/04/2013 | Record vote | Journal Page: 699 | |
Senate | 04/04/2013 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 699 | |
Senate | 04/04/2013 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 699 | |
Senate | 04/04/2013 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 699 | |
Senate | 04/04/2013 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 699 | |
Senate | 04/04/2013 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/21/2013 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/21/2013 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/21/2013 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 569 | |
Senate | 03/19/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/19/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/25/2013 | Referred to Business & Commerce | Journal Page: 290 | |
Senate | 02/25/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 290 | |
Senate | 02/21/2013 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/21/2013 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |