Senate
|
05/10/2013
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2013
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 1576
|
Senate
|
05/06/2013
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2013
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2013
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2013
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2013
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2013
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2013
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2013
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2013
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2013
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2013
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2013
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2013
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 518
|
Senate
|
03/13/2013
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2013
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2013
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2013
|
Referred to Economic Development
|
|
Journal Page: 304
|
Senate
|
02/26/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 304
|
Senate
|
02/22/2013
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2013
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|