E | 05/18/2013 | Effective on 9/1/13 | ||
E | 05/18/2013 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 2258 | |
E | 05/09/2013 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 1728 | |
House | 05/09/2013 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 3016 | |
Senate | 05/09/2013 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 1680 | |
Senate | 05/08/2013 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 1728 | |
Senate | 05/08/2013 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 1591 | |
House | 05/07/2013 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2624 | |
House | 05/07/2013 | Record vote | RV#644 | Journal Page: 2624 |
House | 05/07/2013 | Passed | Journal Page: 2624 | |
House | 05/07/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2624 | |
House | 05/06/2013 | Passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 2540 | |
House | 05/06/2013 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2540 | |
House | 05/06/2013 | Laid out in lieu of companion | HB 2172 | Journal Page: 2540 |
House | 04/30/2013 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/30/2013 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/29/2013 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2075 | |
House | 04/23/2013 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/23/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/22/2013 | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 1733 | |
House | 04/22/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1733 | |
House | 04/18/2013 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1654 | |
Senate | 04/18/2013 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1119 | |
Senate | 04/18/2013 | Passed | Journal Page: 979 | |
Senate | 04/18/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 979 | |
Senate | 04/18/2013 | Record vote | Journal Page: 979 | |
Senate | 04/18/2013 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 979 | |
Senate | 04/18/2013 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 979 | |
Senate | 04/18/2013 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 979 | |
Senate | 04/18/2013 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 979 | |
Senate | 04/18/2013 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/08/2013 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/08/2013 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/08/2013 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 753 | |
Senate | 04/04/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/04/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/02/2013 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/02/2013 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/02/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/02/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/26/2013 | Referred to Criminal Justice | Journal Page: 304 | |
Senate | 02/26/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 304 | |
Senate | 02/22/2013 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/22/2013 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |