House | 04/15/2013 | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 1559 | |
House | 04/15/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1559 | |
House | 04/11/2013 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1511 | |
Senate | 04/10/2013 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 884 | |
Senate | 04/10/2013 | Passed | Journal Page: 793 | |
Senate | 04/10/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 793 | |
Senate | 04/10/2013 | Record vote | Journal Page: 793 | |
Senate | 04/10/2013 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 793 | |
Senate | 04/10/2013 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 793 | |
Senate | 04/10/2013 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 793 | |
Senate | 04/10/2013 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 792 | |
Senate | 04/10/2013 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/09/2013 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/04/2013 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/02/2013 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/02/2013 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 680 | |
Senate | 03/26/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/12/2013 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/12/2013 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/12/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/12/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/26/2013 | Referred to Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 305 | |
Senate | 02/26/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 305 | |
Senate | 02/22/2013 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/22/2013 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |