Texas 2013 83rd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB753 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Patrick S.B. No. 753
 (In the Senate - Filed February 22, 2013; February 26, 2013,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Jurisprudence;
 April 2, 2013, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 5, Nays 0; April 2, 2013,
 sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 753 By:  Paxton


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the production of the index of the parties to all suits
 by the clerk of a district court.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 51.303, Government Code, is amended by
 adding Subsection (d) to read as follows:
 (d)  On application by any person, the clerk of a district
 court shall promptly produce the index of the parties to all suits,
 or a portion of the index, not otherwise confidential by law for
 inspection or copying. If the index is in an electronic form, the
 clerk shall provide an electronic copy of the index or the portion
 of the index for a fee set in accordance with the rules prescribed
 by the attorney general that are applicable to the provision of
 electronic copies of public information.
 SECTION 2.  Subchapter D, Chapter 101, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Section 101.06111 to read as follows:
 Sec. 101.06111.  ADDITIONAL DISTRICT COURT FEES:  GOVERNMENT
 CODE. The clerk of a district court shall collect a fee for
 providing an electronic copy of the index of the parties to all
 suits, or a portion of the index, not otherwise confidential by law
 under Section 51.303, Government Code, in an amount set in
 accordance with the rules prescribed by the attorney general that
 are applicable to the provision of electronic copies of public
 information.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 * * * * *