House
|
05/19/2013
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2013
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2013
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3910
|
House
|
05/15/2013
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2013
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2013
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2013
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2013
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2013
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2013
|
Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures
|
|
Journal Page: 2274
|
House
|
05/02/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2274
|
House
|
04/24/2013
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1827
|
Senate
|
04/23/2013
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1203
|
Senate
|
04/23/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1143
|
Senate
|
04/23/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1143
|
Senate
|
04/23/2013
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1143
|
Senate
|
04/23/2013
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1143
|
Senate
|
04/23/2013
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1143
|
Senate
|
04/23/2013
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1143
|
Senate
|
04/23/2013
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1143
|
Senate
|
04/23/2013
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 Hegar
|
Journal Page: 1142
|
Senate
|
04/23/2013
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1142
|
Senate
|
04/23/2013
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1142
|
Senate
|
04/18/2013
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2013
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2013
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2013
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 976
|
Senate
|
04/10/2013
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2013
|
Referred to Intergovernmental Relations
|
|
Journal Page: 306
|
Senate
|
02/26/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 306
|
Senate
|
02/22/2013
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2013
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|