Senate | 05/06/2013 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/03/2013 | Motion withdrawn | Journal Page: 1414 | |
Senate | 05/03/2013 | Motion to suspend regular order of business | Journal Page: 1414 | |
Senate | 05/03/2013 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/10/2013 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/09/2013 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/03/2013 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/03/2013 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 695 | |
Senate | 03/26/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/26/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/19/2013 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/19/2013 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/19/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/19/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/26/2013 | Referred to Criminal Justice | Journal Page: 306 | |
Senate | 02/26/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 306 | |
Senate | 02/22/2013 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/22/2013 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |