House
|
05/22/2013
|
Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm.
|
|
Journal Page: 4157
|
House
|
05/22/2013
|
Withdrawn from calendar
|
|
Journal Page: 4157
|
House
|
05/22/2013
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2013
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2013
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2013
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2013
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3673
|
House
|
05/13/2013
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2013
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2013
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2013
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2013
|
Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence
|
|
Journal Page: 1824
|
House
|
04/24/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1824
|
House
|
04/18/2013
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1654
|
Senate
|
04/18/2013
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1119
|
Senate
|
04/18/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 979
|
Senate
|
04/18/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 979
|
Senate
|
04/18/2013
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 979
|
Senate
|
04/18/2013
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 979
|
Senate
|
04/18/2013
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 979
|
Senate
|
04/18/2013
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 979
|
Senate
|
04/18/2013
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 979
|
Senate
|
04/18/2013
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2013
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2013
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2013
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2013
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2013
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 754
|
Senate
|
04/03/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2013
|
No action taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2013
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2013
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2013
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2013
|
Referred to Jurisprudence
|
|
Journal Page: 306
|
Senate
|
02/26/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 306
|
Senate
|
02/22/2013
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2013
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|