E
|
06/14/2013
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
06/14/2013
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3868
|
E
|
05/20/2013
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 2258
|
House
|
05/20/2013
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 3898
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2069
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 2258
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
House passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 1945
|
House
|
05/17/2013
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3555
|
House
|
05/17/2013
|
Record vote
|
RV#906
|
Journal Page: 3554
|
House
|
05/17/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3554
|
House
|
05/17/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3554
|
House
|
05/17/2013
|
Constitutional three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 3546
|
House
|
05/16/2013
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3424
|
House
|
05/16/2013
|
Passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 3423
|
House
|
05/16/2013
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3423
|
House
|
05/16/2013
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2013
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2013
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2013
|
Transferred to Calendars Committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2013
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2013
|
Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm.
|
|
Journal Page: 2738
|
House
|
05/08/2013
|
Withdrawn from calendar
|
|
Journal Page: 2738
|
House
|
05/08/2013
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2013
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2013
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2013
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2013
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2365
|
House
|
04/30/2013
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2013
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2013
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2013
|
Referred to Agriculture & Livestock
|
|
Journal Page: 1626
|
House
|
04/17/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1626
|
House
|
04/17/2013
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1627
|
Senate
|
04/16/2013
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 976
|
Senate
|
04/16/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 920
|
Senate
|
04/16/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 920
|
Senate
|
04/16/2013
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 920
|
Senate
|
04/16/2013
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 920
|
Senate
|
04/16/2013
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 920
|
Senate
|
04/16/2013
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 920
|
Senate
|
04/16/2013
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 920
|
Senate
|
04/15/2013
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2013
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2013
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2013
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 883
|
Senate
|
04/08/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2013
|
Referred to Agriculture, Rural Affairs & Homeland Security
|
|
Journal Page: 307
|
Senate
|
02/26/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 307
|
Senate
|
02/22/2013
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2013
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|