House | 05/17/2013 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/17/2013 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/16/2013 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 3673 | |
House | 05/15/2013 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/15/2013 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 05/13/2013 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 05/13/2013 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 05/13/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 05/13/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 05/06/2013 | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 2544 | |
House | 05/06/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2544 | |
House | 04/25/2013 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1911 | |
Senate | 04/25/2013 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1312 | |
Senate | 04/25/2013 | Passed | Journal Page: 1226 | |
Senate | 04/25/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1226 | |
Senate | 04/25/2013 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1226 | |
Senate | 04/25/2013 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1226 | |
Senate | 04/25/2013 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1256 | |
Senate | 04/24/2013 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1192 | |
Senate | 04/24/2013 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 1192 | |
Senate | 04/24/2013 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1192 | |
Senate | 04/24/2013 | Amended | Journal Page: 1192 | |
Senate | 04/24/2013 | Amendment(s) offered | FA1 Hinojosa | Journal Page: 1191 |
Senate | 04/24/2013 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1191 | |
Senate | 04/24/2013 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1191 | |
Senate | 04/23/2013 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/18/2013 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/18/2013 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 1073 | |
Senate | 04/17/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/17/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/26/2013 | Referred to Criminal Justice | Journal Page: 307 | |
Senate | 02/26/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 307 | |
Senate | 02/22/2013 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/22/2013 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |