House | 05/20/2013 | Returned to committee | Journal Page: 3831 | |
House | 05/20/2013 | Point of order sustained | Rule 4, Section 32(c)(3) | Journal Page: 3831 |
House | 05/20/2013 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3830 | |
House | 05/20/2013 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/16/2013 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/16/2013 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/15/2013 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/15/2013 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 3521 | |
House | 05/13/2013 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 05/13/2013 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 05/13/2013 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/24/2013 | Referred to Environmental Regulation | Journal Page: 1824 | |
House | 04/24/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1824 | |
House | 04/24/2013 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1827 | |
Senate | 04/23/2013 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1203 | |
Senate | 04/23/2013 | Passed | Journal Page: 1138 | |
Senate | 04/23/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1138 | |
Senate | 04/23/2013 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1138 | |
Senate | 04/23/2013 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 1138 | |
Senate | 04/23/2013 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1138 | |
Senate | 04/23/2013 | Amendment adopted as amended | FA1 Seliger | Journal Page: 1138 |
Senate | 04/23/2013 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1138 | |
Senate | 04/23/2013 | Amendment amended | Journal Page: 1138 | |
Senate | 04/23/2013 | Amendment to amendment offered | FA6 Seliger | Journal Page: 1137 |
Senate | 04/23/2013 | Motion to table fails | Journal Page: 1137 | |
Senate | 04/23/2013 | Amendment(s) offered | FA1 Seliger | Journal Page: 1129 |
Senate | 04/23/2013 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1129 | |
Senate | 04/23/2013 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1128 | |
Senate | 04/16/2013 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/08/2013 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/08/2013 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 754 | |
Senate | 04/02/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/26/2013 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/26/2013 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/26/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/26/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/05/2013 | Referred to Natural Resources | Journal Page: 353 | |
Senate | 03/05/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 353 | |
Senate | 02/25/2013 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/25/2013 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |