E
|
06/14/2013
|
Effective on 9/1/13
|
|
|
E
|
06/14/2013
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3868
|
E
|
05/28/2013
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3867
|
House
|
05/27/2013
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 5435
|
Senate
|
05/27/2013
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3864
|
Senate
|
05/27/2013
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 3866
|
House
|
05/27/2013
|
House adopts resolution for tech. correction
|
SCR 44
|
Journal Page: 5403
|
Senate
|
05/26/2013
|
Senate adopts resolution for tech. correction
|
SCR 44
|
Journal Page: 3778
|
Senate
|
05/26/2013
|
House adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3832
|
House
|
05/26/2013
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 5255
|
House
|
05/26/2013
|
Record vote
|
RV#1352
|
Journal Page: 5254
|
House
|
05/26/2013
|
House adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 5254
|
House
|
05/26/2013
|
Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5389
|
Senate
|
05/26/2013
|
Senate adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 3777
|
House
|
05/25/2013
|
Conf. Comm. Report distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2013
|
Conference committee report filed
|
|
Journal Page: 3394
|
Senate
|
05/23/2013
|
House appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3052
|
Senate
|
05/23/2013
|
House grants request for conf comm-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3052
|
House
|
05/23/2013
|
House appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 4499
|
House
|
05/23/2013
|
House grants request for conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 4499
|
House
|
05/22/2013
|
Senate appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4291
|
House
|
05/22/2013
|
Senate requests conference committee-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4291
|
House
|
05/22/2013
|
Senate refuses to concur-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4291
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Senate appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 2693
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Senate requests conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 2693
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Senate refuses to concur
|
|
Journal Page: 2693
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 2693
|
Senate
|
05/22/2013
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2670
|
Senate
|
05/20/2013
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2165
|
House
|
05/20/2013
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3780
|
House
|
05/20/2013
|
Record vote
|
RV#980
|
Journal Page: 3780
|
House
|
05/20/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3780
|
House
|
05/20/2013
|
Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3778
|
House
|
05/20/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3778
|
House
|
05/17/2013
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3646
|
House
|
05/17/2013
|
Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3645
|
House
|
05/17/2013
|
Amendment withdrawn
|
17-Taylor, et al.
|
Journal Page: 3645
|
House
|
05/17/2013
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 3645
|
House
|
05/17/2013
|
Postponed
|
5/17/13 5:45 PM
|
Journal Page: 3641
|
House
|
05/17/2013
|
Point of order withdrawn (amendment)
|
.
|
Journal Page: 3641
|
House
|
05/17/2013
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
17-Taylor, Guillen, G. Bonnen, Hughes, and Sanford
|
Journal Page: 3641
|
House
|
05/17/2013
|
Amended
|
16-Eiland
|
Journal Page: 3638
|
House
|
05/17/2013
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3632
|
House
|
05/17/2013
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3620
|
House
|
05/17/2013
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2013
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2013
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2013
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2013
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3242
|
House
|
05/09/2013
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2013
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2013
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2013
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2013
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2013
|
Referred to Public Health
|
|
Journal Page: 1677
|
House
|
04/18/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1677
|
House
|
04/16/2013
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1580
|
Senate
|
04/15/2013
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 942
|
Senate
|
04/15/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 900
|
Senate
|
04/15/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 900
|
Senate
|
04/15/2013
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 900
|
Senate
|
04/15/2013
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 900
|
Senate
|
04/15/2013
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 900
|
Senate
|
04/15/2013
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 900
|
Senate
|
04/15/2013
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 900
|
Senate
|
04/15/2013
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA2 Uresti
|
Journal Page: 899
|
Senate
|
04/15/2013
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 897
|
Senate
|
04/15/2013
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 897
|
Senate
|
04/10/2013
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2013
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 323
|
Senate
|
02/26/2013
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2013
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2013
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 310
|
Senate
|
02/19/2013
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/30/2013
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 139
|
Senate
|
01/28/2013
|
Referred to Health & Human Services
|
|
Journal Page: 88
|
Senate
|
01/28/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 88
|
Senate
|
01/23/2013
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 83
|
Senate
|
01/16/2013
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/16/2013
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|