Senate | 04/18/2013 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/18/2013 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/18/2013 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 1073 | |
Senate | 04/17/2013 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/17/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/17/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/16/2013 | Meeting cancelled | ||
Senate | 04/16/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/05/2013 | Referred to Criminal Justice | Journal Page: 356 | |
Senate | 03/05/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 356 | |
Senate | 03/04/2013 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 334 | |
Senate | 02/26/2013 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/26/2013 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |