E | 06/14/2013 | Effective immediately | ||
E | 06/14/2013 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 3869 | |
E | 05/16/2013 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 1908 | |
House | 05/16/2013 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 3519 | |
Senate | 05/16/2013 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 1896 | |
Senate | 05/15/2013 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 1908 | |
Senate | 05/15/2013 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 1822 | |
House | 05/14/2013 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3209 | |
House | 05/14/2013 | Record vote | RV#815 | Journal Page: 3210 |
House | 05/14/2013 | Passed | Journal Page: 3210 | |
House | 05/14/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3210 | |
House | 05/14/2013 | Passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 3203 | |
House | 05/14/2013 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3203 | |
House | 05/14/2013 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 05/13/2013 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 05/07/2013 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 05/06/2013 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/06/2013 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2722 | |
House | 05/02/2013 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/02/2013 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 05/02/2013 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/30/2013 | Referred to Insurance | Journal Page: 2073 | |
House | 04/30/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2073 | |
House | 04/25/2013 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1910 | |
Senate | 04/25/2013 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1312 | |
Senate | 04/25/2013 | Passed | Journal Page: 1231 | |
Senate | 04/25/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1231 | |
Senate | 04/25/2013 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1231 | |
Senate | 04/25/2013 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1231 | |
Senate | 04/25/2013 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1231 | |
Senate | 04/25/2013 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1231 | |
Senate | 04/25/2013 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1231 | |
Senate | 04/24/2013 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/22/2013 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/22/2013 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/22/2013 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 1119 | |
Senate | 04/22/2013 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/22/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/22/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/05/2013 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 358 | |
Senate | 03/05/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 358 | |
Senate | 02/26/2013 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/26/2013 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |