E
|
06/14/2013
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
06/14/2013
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3869
|
E
|
05/27/2013
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3867
|
House
|
05/26/2013
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 5381
|
Senate
|
05/26/2013
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3778
|
Senate
|
05/24/2013
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 3737
|
Senate
|
05/23/2013
|
House passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2918
|
House
|
05/22/2013
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4166
|
House
|
05/22/2013
|
Record vote
|
RV#1057
|
Journal Page: 4166
|
House
|
05/22/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 4166
|
House
|
05/22/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4166
|
House
|
05/22/2013
|
Passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 4099
|
House
|
05/22/2013
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 4099
|
House
|
05/22/2013
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2013
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2013
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2013
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2013
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3673
|
House
|
05/15/2013
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2013
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2013
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2013
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2013
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2013
|
Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures
|
|
Journal Page: 2544
|
House
|
05/06/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2544
|
House
|
05/01/2013
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2159
|
Senate
|
05/01/2013
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1408
|
Senate
|
05/01/2013
|
Remarks ordered printed
|
|
Journal Page: 1347
|
Senate
|
05/01/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1347
|
Senate
|
05/01/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1347
|
Senate
|
05/01/2013
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1347
|
Senate
|
05/01/2013
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1347
|
Senate
|
05/01/2013
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1346
|
Senate
|
05/01/2013
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1346
|
Senate
|
05/01/2013
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1346
|
Senate
|
04/30/2013
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2013
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2013
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2013
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 1312
|
Senate
|
04/24/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2013
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1201
|
Senate
|
04/10/2013
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2013
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2013
|
Referred to Transportation
|
|
Journal Page: 358
|
Senate
|
03/05/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 358
|
Senate
|
02/26/2013
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2013
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|