Senate | 04/18/2013 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 1071 | |
House | 04/17/2013 | Referred to Higher Education | Journal Page: 1626 | |
House | 04/17/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1626 | |
House | 04/17/2013 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1627 | |
Senate | 04/16/2013 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 976 | |
Senate | 04/16/2013 | Passed | Journal Page: 928 | |
Senate | 04/16/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 928 | |
Senate | 04/16/2013 | Record vote | Journal Page: 928 | |
Senate | 04/16/2013 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 928 | |
Senate | 04/16/2013 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 928 | |
Senate | 04/16/2013 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 928 | |
Senate | 04/16/2013 | Amended | Journal Page: 928 | |
Senate | 04/16/2013 | Amendment(s) offered | FA1 Birdwell | Journal Page: 928 |
Senate | 04/16/2013 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 928 | |
Senate | 04/16/2013 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 927 | |
Senate | 04/16/2013 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/10/2013 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/09/2013 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/04/2013 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/04/2013 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 732 | |
Senate | 04/03/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/03/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/27/2013 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 03/27/2013 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/27/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/27/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/05/2013 | Referred to Higher Education | Journal Page: 359 | |
Senate | 03/05/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 359 | |
Senate | 02/26/2013 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/26/2013 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |