House
|
05/21/2013
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2013
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2013
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2013
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2013
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3242
|
House
|
05/09/2013
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2013
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2013
|
Scheduled for formal meeting on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2013
|
Referred to Corrections
|
|
Journal Page: 1826
|
House
|
04/24/2013
|
Correction in referral
|
|
Journal Page: 1826
|
House
|
04/22/2013
|
Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence
|
|
Journal Page: 1733
|
House
|
04/22/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1733
|
House
|
04/19/2013
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1697
|
Senate
|
04/18/2013
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1119
|
Senate
|
04/18/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1003
|
Senate
|
04/18/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1003
|
Senate
|
04/18/2013
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1003
|
Senate
|
04/18/2013
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1003
|
Senate
|
04/18/2013
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1003
|
Senate
|
04/18/2013
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1003
|
Senate
|
04/18/2013
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1003
|
Senate
|
04/16/2013
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2013
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2013
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2013
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 884
|
Senate
|
04/09/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2013
|
No action taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2013
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2013
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2013
|
Referred to Criminal Justice
|
|
Journal Page: 361
|
Senate
|
03/05/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 361
|
Senate
|
02/27/2013
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2013
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|