House | 05/17/2013 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 05/17/2013 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/16/2013 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 3673 | |
House | 05/14/2013 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/14/2013 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 05/14/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 05/13/2013 | Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures | Journal Page: 3190 | |
House | 05/13/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 3190 | |
House | 05/03/2013 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 2364 | |
Senate | 05/03/2013 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1500 | |
Senate | 05/03/2013 | Passed | Journal Page: 1429 | |
Senate | 05/03/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1429 | |
Senate | 05/03/2013 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1429 | |
Senate | 05/03/2013 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1429 | |
Senate | 05/03/2013 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1429 | |
Senate | 05/03/2013 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 1428 | |
Senate | 05/03/2013 | Amended | Journal Page: 1428 | |
Senate | 05/03/2013 | Amendment(s) offered | FA1 Van de Putte | Journal Page: 1428 |
Senate | 05/03/2013 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1428 | |
Senate | 05/03/2013 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1428 | |
Senate | 05/02/2013 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/01/2013 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/01/2013 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/01/2013 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 1371 | |
Senate | 04/30/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/09/2013 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/09/2013 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/09/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/09/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/05/2013 | Referred to Business & Commerce | Journal Page: 361 | |
Senate | 03/05/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 361 | |
Senate | 02/27/2013 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/27/2013 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |