E | 05/24/2013 | Effective on 9/1/13 | ||
E | 05/24/2013 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 3396 | |
E | 05/13/2013 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 1765 | |
House | 05/13/2013 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 3190 | |
Senate | 05/13/2013 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 1759 | |
Senate | 05/09/2013 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 1728 | |
Senate | 05/09/2013 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 1695 | |
House | 05/08/2013 | Record vote | RV#669 | Journal Page: 2763 |
House | 05/08/2013 | Passed | Journal Page: 2763 | |
House | 05/08/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2763 | |
House | 05/08/2013 | Passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 2738 | |
House | 05/08/2013 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2738 | |
House | 05/08/2013 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 05/07/2013 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 05/02/2013 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 05/02/2013 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/01/2013 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2276 | |
House | 04/30/2013 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/30/2013 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 04/30/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/22/2013 | Referred to Business & Industry | Journal Page: 1733 | |
House | 04/22/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1733 | |
House | 04/18/2013 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1651 | |
Senate | 04/17/2013 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1073 | |
Senate | 04/17/2013 | Passed | Journal Page: 955 | |
Senate | 04/17/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 955 | |
Senate | 04/17/2013 | Record vote | Journal Page: 955 | |
Senate | 04/17/2013 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 955 | |
Senate | 04/17/2013 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 955 | |
Senate | 04/17/2013 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 955 | |
Senate | 04/17/2013 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 955 | |
Senate | 04/16/2013 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 04/11/2013 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 04/11/2013 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 04/11/2013 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 884 | |
Senate | 04/10/2013 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/10/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/10/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/05/2013 | Referred to Intergovernmental Relations | Journal Page: 362 | |
Senate | 03/05/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 362 | |
Senate | 02/27/2013 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/27/2013 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |