E
|
06/14/2013
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
06/14/2013
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3869
|
E
|
05/28/2013
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3867
|
House
|
05/27/2013
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 5435
|
Senate
|
05/27/2013
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3853
|
Senate
|
05/26/2013
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 3866
|
House
|
05/24/2013
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4872
|
Senate
|
05/23/2013
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 3054
|
Senate
|
05/23/2013
|
Senate concurs in House amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 3054
|
Senate
|
05/23/2013
|
Read
|
|
Journal Page: 3054
|
Senate
|
05/23/2013
|
House amendment(s) laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3053
|
Senate
|
05/17/2013
|
House passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 1945
|
House
|
05/17/2013
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3566
|
House
|
05/17/2013
|
Record vote
|
RV#921
|
Journal Page: 3565
|
House
|
05/17/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3565
|
House
|
05/17/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3565
|
House
|
05/17/2013
|
Constitutional three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 3546
|
House
|
05/16/2013
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3460
|
House
|
05/16/2013
|
Amended
|
3-D. Bonnen
|
Journal Page: 3460
|
House
|
05/16/2013
|
Amendment withdrawn
|
2-Dutton
|
Journal Page: 3460
|
House
|
05/16/2013
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 3460
|
House
|
05/16/2013
|
Postponed
|
5/16/13 2:30 PM
|
Journal Page: 3431
|
House
|
05/16/2013
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
2-Dutton and Hilderbran
|
Journal Page: 3430
|
House
|
05/16/2013
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3429
|
House
|
05/16/2013
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/14/2013
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2013
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2013
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2013
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2076
|
House
|
04/26/2013
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2013
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2013
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2013
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2013
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2013
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1726
|
House
|
04/15/2013
|
Referred to State Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 1559
|
House
|
04/15/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1559
|
House
|
04/04/2013
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1426
|
Senate
|
04/04/2013
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 754
|
Senate
|
04/04/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 717
|
Senate
|
04/04/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 717
|
Senate
|
04/04/2013
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 717
|
Senate
|
04/04/2013
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 717
|
Senate
|
04/04/2013
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 717
|
Senate
|
04/04/2013
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 717
|
Senate
|
04/04/2013
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 717
|
Senate
|
04/03/2013
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2013
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2013
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 660
|
Senate
|
03/27/2013
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2013
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 619
|
Senate
|
03/20/2013
|
Reported from s/c favorably with substitute
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2013
|
Testimony taken in subcommittee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2013
|
Considered by s/c in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2013
|
Left pending in subcommittee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2013
|
Testimony taken in subcommittee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2013
|
Considered by s/c in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2013
|
Left pending in subcommittee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2013
|
Testimony taken in subcommittee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2013
|
Considered by s/c in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2013
|
Referred to s/c on Public-Private Partnerships by Chair
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2013
|
Referred to Economic Development
|
|
Journal Page: 322
|
Senate
|
02/27/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 322
|
Senate
|
02/27/2013
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2013
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|