Senate | 05/07/2013 | No action taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/30/2013 | No action taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/16/2013 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 04/16/2013 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 04/16/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 04/16/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/11/2013 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 395 | |
Senate | 03/05/2013 | Referred to Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 362 | |
Senate | 03/05/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 362 | |
Senate | 02/27/2013 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/27/2013 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |