Texas 2013 - 83rd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB899 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Van de Putte S.B. No. 899
 (In the Senate - Filed February 27, 2013; March 5, 2013,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Jurisprudence;
 April 25, 2013, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 5, Nays 0; April 25, 2013,
 sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 899 By:  Hancock


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to determination of the amount of certain child support
 obligations.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subsection (b), Section 154.062, Family Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (b)  Resources include:
 (1)  100 percent of all wage and salary income and other
 compensation for personal services (including commissions,
 overtime pay, tips, and bonuses);
 (2)  interest, dividends, and royalty income;
 (3)  self-employment income;
 (4)  net rental income (defined as rent after deducting
 operating expenses and mortgage payments, but not including noncash
 items such as depreciation); and
 (5)  all other income actually being received,
 including severance pay, retirement benefits, pensions, trust
 income, annuities, capital gains, social security benefits other
 than supplemental security income, United States Department of
 Veterans Affairs disability benefits other than
 non-service-connected disability pension benefits, as defined by
 38 U.S.C. Section 101(17), unemployment benefits, disability and
 workers' compensation benefits, interest income from notes
 regardless of the source, gifts and prizes, spousal maintenance,
 and alimony.
 SECTION 2.  Section 154.066, Family Code, is amended to read
 as follows:
 Sec. 154.066.  INTENTIONAL UNEMPLOYMENT OR UNDEREMPLOYMENT.
 (a)  If the actual income of the obligor is significantly less than
 what the obligor could earn because of intentional unemployment or
 underemployment, the court may apply the support guidelines to the
 earning potential of the obligor.
 (b)  In determining whether an obligor is intentionally
 unemployed or underemployed, the court may consider evidence that
 the obligor is a veteran, as defined by 38 U.S.C. Section 101(2),
 who is seeking or has been awarded:
 (1)  United States Department of Veterans Affairs
 disability benefits, as defined by 38 U.S.C. Section 101(16); or
 (2)  non-service-connected disability pension
 benefits, as defined by 38 U.S.C. Section 101(17).
 SECTION 3.  Section 154.068, Family Code, is amended to read
 as follows:
 Sec. 154.068.  WAGE AND SALARY PRESUMPTION.  In the absence
 of evidence of a party's resources, as defined by Section
 154.062(b) [the wage and salary income of a party], the court shall
 presume that the party has income [wages or salary] equal to the
 federal minimum wage for a 40-hour week to which the support
 guidelines may be applied.
 SECTION 4.  The changes in law made by this Act to Sections
 154.062, 154.066, and 154.068, Family Code, apply only to a
 proceeding to establish or modify a child support obligation that
 is pending in a trial court on or filed on or after the effective
 date of this Act.
 SECTION 5.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2013.
 * * * * *